Directorate Change
01 7월 2002 - 4:30PM
UK Regulatory
RNS Number:9268X
Portman Building Society
1 July 2002
1 July 2002
BOARD CHANGES AT PORTMAN
The Portman Building Society has announced that Lord Stewartby and Rosie Barnes
retired as Non-Executive Directors of the Society on 30 June 2002.
The Portman's Chairman John Roques said, "Throughout their time on the Portman
Board both Ian and Rosie have made a significant contribution to the Portman,
during a period of significant and excellent growth for the Society. I would
like to thank them for their commitment to the Portman and wish them well with
their future plans."
-ENDS-
Editor's notes:
1. Lord Stewartby was appointed to the Portman Board on 1 May 1995.
2. Rosie Barnes was appointed to the Board on 1 November 1997.
For further information please contact:
Andrew Jones
Group Secretary
01202 563600
This information is provided by RNS
The company news service from the London Stock Exchange
Citi Fun 29 (LSE:BP19)
과거 데이터 주식 차트
부터 9월(9) 2024 으로 10월(10) 2024
Citi Fun 29 (LSE:BP19)
과거 데이터 주식 차트
부터 10월(10) 2023 으로 10월(10) 2024
Citi Fun 29 (런던증권거래소)의 실시간 뉴스: 최근 기사 0
More Portman Building Sty News Articles